There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs health care center in Center Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Abie Abraham VA Clinic".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/13/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-9. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2017 Signed by President.
03/01/2017 Presented to President.
02/17/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/17/2017 Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1415)
02/13/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1104-1105)
01/23/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
03/13/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-9. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2017 Signed by President.
03/01/2017 House Presented to President.
02/17/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
02/17/2017 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/17/2017 Senate Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1415)
02/14/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/13/2017-4:42pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/13/2017-4:42pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1104-1105)
02/13/2017-4:30pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 609.
02/13/2017-4:30pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1104-1106)
02/13/2017-4:30pm House Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/03/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/23/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/23/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/23/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/03/2017 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/14/2017 Referred to
02/17/2017 Discharged from

Related Bills (0)

As of 09/19/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.609 - To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs health care center in Center Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Abie Abraham VA Clinic"..

Subjects (7)

  • Congressional tributes
  • Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Health facilities and institutions
  • Military personnel and dependents
  • Pennsylvania
  • Veterans' medical care

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.609. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-9 (03/13/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs health care center in Center Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Abie Abraham VA Clinic."