There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Metastatic Breast Cancer Access to Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to eliminate the waiting periods for disability insurance benefits and Medicare coverage for individuals with metastatic breast cancer, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/14/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/26/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/14/2018Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/14/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (96)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/14/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/14/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 06/14/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/14/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/21/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/26/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/26/2018
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 06/26/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/27/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/12/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/12/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/12/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/12/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/12/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/03/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/03/2018
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 09/04/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/04/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/04/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/04/2018
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 09/04/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/06/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/06/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/13/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/25/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/25/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/25/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/25/2018
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 09/25/2018
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/25/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/25/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 09/25/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/25/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/25/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/25/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/25/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/27/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/27/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/27/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/27/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/28/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/28/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 09/28/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/28/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/05/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 10/05/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/05/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/05/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/05/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/05/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/05/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 10/12/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/12/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/12/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 10/12/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 10/12/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 10/26/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/16/2018
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 12/21/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means06/14/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6114.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6114. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/14/2018)

Metastatic Breast Cancer Access to Care Act

This bill specifies that individuals with metastatic breast cancer are not subject to certain waiting periods for disability insurance benefits under the Old-Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance program and related Medicare coverage.