There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Lieutenant Osvaldo Albarati Correctional Officer Self-Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Lieutenant Osvaldo Albarati Correctional Officer Self-Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to require that the Director of the Bureau of Prisons ensure that each chief executive officer of a Federal penal or correctional institution provides a secure storage area located outside of the secure perimeter of the Federal penal or correctional institution for firearms carried by certain employees of the Bureau of Prisons, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/15/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 181).(text: CR H3955)
05/15/2018Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-674.
01/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
05/16/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/15/2018-6:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2018-6:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 181). (text: CR H3955)
05/15/2018-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3955-3956)
05/15/2018-4:12pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/15/2018-3:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 613.
05/15/2018-3:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3940-3942)
05/15/2018-3:53pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/15/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 519.
05/15/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-674.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/08/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/23/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/23/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/23/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 01/23/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/23/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 01/31/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/07/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 02/13/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/13/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/13/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/13/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/15/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/28/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/28/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/28/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/28/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/28/2017
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/08/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/08/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/08/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/08/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/08/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/08/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/08/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/15/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/21/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/29/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/29/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/29/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/04/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 04/04/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/26/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/26/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/26/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/27/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 04/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/02/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/11/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/17/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/12/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 08/04/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/10/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/23/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/23/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 10/31/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/14/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/23/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/23/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/20/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/23/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Markup by
05/15/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-674
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/08/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/16/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.613. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/23/2017)

Lieutenant Osvaldo Albarati Correctional Officer Self-Protection Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal criminal code to require the Bureau of Prisons (BOP) to allow a correctional officer at a federal prison or correctional institution to: (1) store firearms on BOP premises in a secure storage area outside the security perimeter of the institution or in a vehicle lockbox, and (2) carry a concealed firearm on BOP premises outside the security perimeter of the institution.