There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Cottonwood Land Exchange Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Cottonwood Land Exchange Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Cottonwood Land Exchange Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize, direct, expedite, and facilitate a land exchange in Yavapai County, Arizona, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9483-9484)
08/10/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-895.
06/19/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/13/2018-4:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2018-4:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9483-9484)
11/13/2018-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6146.
11/13/2018-4:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9483-9484)
11/13/2018-4:33pmHouseMr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/10/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 692.
08/10/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-895.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/18/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
07/17/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
06/27/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/19/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/19/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 06/19/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/19/2018
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 06/19/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/19/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/21/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/19/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
08/10/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-895
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/27/2018 Referred to
07/17/2018 Hearings by
07/18/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/14/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6146.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6146. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/19/2018)

Cottonwood Land Exchange Act of 2018

This bill directs the Department of Agriculture, upon request by Yavapai County, Arizona, to convey to the county 80 acres of land within Coconino National Forest in exchange for 369 acres of county land.