Committees: H.R.6157 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Appropriations
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Defense04/11/2018 Hearings by
04/17/2018 Hearings by
04/24/2018 Hearings by
04/26/2018 Hearings by
05/09/2018 Hearings by
05/15/2018 Hearings by
05/17/2018 Hearings by
House Appropriations06/20/2018 Reported original measure H. Rept. 115-769