There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Transportation to conduct a study about the impact of electronic logging devices and report the findings to Congress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/20/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/20/2018Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/03/2018
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 07/11/2018
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/12/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 07/17/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/20/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6159.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6159. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/20/2018)

This bill requires the Department of Transportation to conduct a study to determine how many employees who must comply with the electronic logging device requirements have ceased being operators of a commercial motor vehicle as a result of such requirements.