There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 235 of the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to clarify the standards for family detention, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/21/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
08/02/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/29/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/21/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/25/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/25/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/26/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 07/03/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/21/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security08/02/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security06/21/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security06/29/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6173. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/21/2018)

This bill amends the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to provide that the detention of any alien child who is not an unaccompanied alien child shall be governed by provisions of the Immigration and Nationality Act relating to visa waiver program temporary nonimmigrant tourists. There is no presumption that an alien child who is not an unaccompanied alien child should not be detained, and all such determinations shall be in the discretion of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS).

DHS may not release an alien minor who is not an unaccompanied alien child to any individual other than a parent or legal guardian.

DHS shall detain aliens charged with an improper entry misdemeanor with their children under the age of 18 while the charges are pending.