There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Central America Family Protection and Reunification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of State to help keep Central American families together, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/22/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
08/02/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/22/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (102)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/22/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/22/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/25/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/25/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/25/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/25/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/25/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/25/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/25/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/27/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 06/27/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/27/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/27/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/27/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/27/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/27/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/27/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/03/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/03/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/03/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/03/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/03/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/03/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/06/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/10/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 07/12/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/12/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/12/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/12/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/18/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/19/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/19/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/24/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/24/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/24/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/27/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/04/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/04/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/04/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/04/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/07/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/07/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/22/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary06/22/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security08/02/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6193.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6193. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/2018)

Central America Family Protection and Reunification Act

This bill states that it shall be: (1) U.S. policy to not separate immigrant families as a deterrent and to reunite families that were separated due to the criminal prosecution of parents for illegal entry, and (2) Department of State policy to prioritize supporting governments and citizens to facilitate reunification of such families.

The State Department shall submit to Congress:

  • reports concerning gender-based violence in the Northern Triangle (the region encompassing Guatemala, Honduras, and El Salvador);
  • reports concerning gang and organized-crime related violence in the Northern Triangle;
  • strategies to use portions of funds for the U.S. Strategy for Engagement in Central America to combat gender-based violence in the Northern Triangle, as well as to address the damage to the health and well-being of children and caregivers caused by separating children from their families at the U.S.-Mexico border.

The State Department shall establish an office to study serious crimes committed against aliens who were removed from the United States and against U.S. citizens who left the United States because of having an alien parent who was removed from the United States.