There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish the Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Office, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8113-8115)
09/07/2018Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/07/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-923, Part I.
06/22/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/12/2018-2:46pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2018-2:46pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8113-8115)
09/12/2018-2:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6198.
09/12/2018-2:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8113-8117)
09/12/2018-2:31pmHouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/07/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 716.
09/07/2018HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/07/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-923, Part I.
07/24/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseSubcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Discharged.
07/16/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/22/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/22/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/22/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/22/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/22/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
09/07/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-923
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications07/16/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce06/22/2018 Referred to
09/07/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/17/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.6198. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2018)

Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Office, headed by an Assistant Secretary. The Assistant Secretary shall serve as the principal advisor to DHS on weapons of mass destruction matters and strategies, and on coordinating efforts to counter weapons of mass destruction.

The office shall coordinate DHS strategy and policy to plan, detect, and protect against the importation, possession, storage, transportation, development, or use of unauthorized chemical, biological, radiological, or nuclear materials, devices, or agents.

The Assistant Secretary shall establish the Securing the Cities program to detect and prevent terrorist attacks and other high consequence events utilizing nuclear or other radiological materials that pose a high risk to homeland security in high-risk urban areas.

The bill establishes in the office a Chief Medical Officer who shall serve as the principal advisor to DHS on medical and public health issues. The DHS Under Secretary for Management shall be responsible for workforce-focused health and medical activities of DHS.

DHS shall: (1) transfer to the office all personnel, budget authority, and assets of the Domestic Nuclear Detection Office and the Office of Health Affairs; and (2) provide a briefing and report to Congress on DHS chemical, biological, radiological, and nuclear activities.