There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Restoring Access to Medication and Modernizing Health Savings Accounts Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Restoring Access to Medication Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to include certain over-the-counter medical products as qualified medical expenses.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 277 - 142 (Roll no. 377).(text: CR H7651-7653)
07/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-850.
06/22/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/25/2018-6:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2018-6:21pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 277 - 142 (Roll no. 377). (text: CR H7651-7653)
07/25/2018-6:15pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7667)
07/25/2018-4:37pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 6199, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Blumenauer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage of H.R. 6199 until later in the legislative day.
07/25/2018-4:36pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/25/2018-3:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6199.
07/25/2018-3:49pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 6199. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6199 under a closed rule. Additionally, the rule provides for proceedings for the period from July 27, 2018 through September 3, 2018
07/25/2018-3:49pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1012. (consideration: CR H7651-7658; H7667)
07/24/2018-2:20pmHouseRule H. Res. 1012 passed House.
07/23/2018-7:16pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1012 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6199. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6199 under a closed rule. Additionally, the rule provides for proceedings for the period from July 27, 2018 through September 3, 2018
07/19/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 658.
07/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-850.
07/11/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 10.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/11/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/22/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/22/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/22/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/22/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means06/22/2018 Referred to
07/11/2018 Markup by
07/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-850

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6199. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (07/19/2018)

Restoring Access to Medication Act of 2018

This bill repeals provisions of the Internal Revenue Code, as added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, that limit payments for medications from health savings accounts, medical savings accounts, health flexible spending arrangements, and health reimbursement arrangements to only prescription drugs or insulin (thus allowing distributions from such accounts for over-the-counter drugs). The bill also allows the accounts to be used for menstrual care products.