There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ADA Education and Reform Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 to promote compliance through education, to clarify the requirements for demand letters, to provide for a notice and cure period before the commencement of a private civil action, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
09/07/2017 Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 15 - 9.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/07/2017 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/08/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/24/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/27/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/27/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/22/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/22/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/28/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/28/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/29/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/29/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/05/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/19/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 05/19/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/22/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/22/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/15/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/26/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 08/08/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/08/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/08/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 09/08/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/08/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/08/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/08/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 09/08/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/08/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/08/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/08/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/08/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/08/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/08/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/08/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/08/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/08/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/08/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/08/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 09/08/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/08/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 09/08/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/08/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/14/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/26/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/26/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/28/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/02/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/02/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/02/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 10/04/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 10/04/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/04/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 10/10/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/10/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/10/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 10/12/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/12/2017
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Sponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/15/2017 07/20/2017 H6131

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/24/2017 Referred to
09/07/2017 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/08/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 10/16/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.620 - ADA Education and Reform Act of 2017.

Subjects (6)

  • Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
  • Building construction
  • Civil actions and liability
  • Disability and health-based discrimination
  • State and local government operations

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.620. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

ADA Education and Reform Act of 2017

This bill requires the Disability Rights Section of the Department of Justice to develop a program to educate state and local governments and property owners on strategies for promoting access to public accommodations for persons with a disability. The program may include training for professionals to provide a guidance of remediation for potential violations of the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 (ADA).

The bill prohibits civil actions based on the failure to remove an architectural barrier to access into an existing public accommodation unless: (1) the aggrieved person has provided to the owners or operators a written notice specific enough to identify the barrier, and (2) the owners or operators fail to provide the person with a written description outlining improvements that will be made to improve the barrier or they fail to remove the barrier or make substantial progress after providing such a description. The aggrieved person's notice must specify: (1) the address of the property, (2) the specific ADA sections alleged to have been violated, (3) whether a request for assistance in removing an architectural barrier was made, and (4) whether the barrier was permanent or temporary.

The Judicial Conference of the United States must develop a model program to promote alternative dispute resolution mechanisms to resolve such claims. The model program should include an expedited method for determining relevant facts related to such barriers and steps to resolve accessibility issues before litigation.