There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fairness for Farm Workers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide increased labor law protections for agricultural workers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 06/26/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/26/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/26/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/06/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/06/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 07/06/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/06/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/06/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/18/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/26/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/26/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/12/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/12/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/12/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/26/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6230. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2018)

Fairness for Farm Workers Act

This bill amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 with respect to agricultural workers.

The bill requires employers, beginning in 2019, to compensate agricultural workers for hours worked in excess of their regular hours (i.e., 55 hours in 2019, 50 hours in 2020, 45 hours in 2021, and 40 hours in 2022) at not less than one and one-half times the employee's regular rate. For employers with 25 or fewer employees, the overtime pay requirements begin in 2022. These overtime pay requirements do not apply, as in current law, to employees who are the parent, spouse, child, or other member of the employer's immediate family.

The bill also repeals the exemption from overtime pay requirements for employers in the tobacco industry.