There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Care Packages for Our Heroes Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 39 of the United States Code to direct the Postal Regulatory Commission to promulgate regulations to establish rates of postage for packages shipped by priority mail from the United States to a foreign Army Post Office, Fleet Post Office, or Diplomatic Post Office.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/23/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/28/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/10/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6231.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6231. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2018)

Care Packages for Our Heroes Act of 2018

This bill directs the Postal Regulatory Commission to promulgate regulations to establish rates of postage for packages shipped by priority mail from the United States to a foreign Army Post Office, Fleet Post Office, or Diplomatic Post Office address whereby a person may not be charged for such packages traveling through a zone other than a first or second zone.