There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Family Unity Rights and Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the reunification of families separated upon entry into the United States as a result of the "zero-tolerance" immigration policy requiring criminal prosecution of all adults apprehended crossing the border illegally, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/02/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/10/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/28/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/10/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/10/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/10/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/10/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 07/10/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/23/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/06/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/27/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security08/02/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/27/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources07/10/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services06/27/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6236.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6236. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2018)

Family Unity Rights and Protection Act

This bill requires the Departments of Health and Human Services, Homeland Security, State, and Defense to ensure that alien children (i.e., children under the age of 18 removed from their parents or legal guardians at or near a port of entry or within 100 miles of the U.S. border pursuant to a zero tolerance policy for criminal illegal reentry) are reunited at the earliest possible date with their parents and guardians from whom they were separated. It also requires notification of parents and guardians of procedures for reuniting with such children and for the location of such children.

The bill requires the creation of an electronic registry for information used to locate such alien children and their parents and guardians. The information in such registry may only be used for locating such children and may not be used in any criminal prosecution or other immigration proceeding.

The bill also sets forth conditions on the termination of parental rights in immigration proceedings and requires the consolidation of asylum and immigration proceedings involving alien children.