There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Service Freedom to Negotiate Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To secure the rights of public employees to organize, act concertedly, and bargain collectively, which safeguard the public interest and promote the free and unobstructed flow of commerce, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/27/2018Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 06/28/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/28/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/28/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/28/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/28/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/28/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 06/28/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/28/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/10/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/10/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/10/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/10/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/10/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/19/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/19/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/19/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/19/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/19/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/19/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/26/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 08/03/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/26/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/26/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/26/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/26/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/26/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/27/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6238. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2018)

Public Service Freedom to Negotiate Act of 2018

This bill requires the Federal Labor Relations Authority (FLRA) to make a determination as to whether a state substantially provides for certain rights and responsibilities applicable to public employees, such as granting such employees the right to form or join a labor organization and to bargain collectively, and if the state does not substantially provide for such rights and responsibilities, then such state shall be subject to nationwide standards prescribed by the FLRA to protect public employee rights.

No employer, emergency services employee, or law enforcement officer may engage in a lockout, strike, or any other organized job action of which a reasonably probable result is a measurable disruption of the delivery of emergency or public safety services. No labor organization may violate or attempt to violate this prohibition.