There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Puerto Rico Admission Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enable the admission of the territory of Puerto Rico into the Union as a State, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/11/2018Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6046)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/27/2018Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/27/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 06/27/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 06/27/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/16/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/16/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/18/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/18/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/03/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/03/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/03/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/03/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/03/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 08/03/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 08/03/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 08/24/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/04/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/04/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/05/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/27/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs07/09/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6246.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6246. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2018)

Puerto Rico Admission Act of 2018

This bill establishes a process to enable the U.S. territory of Puerto Rico to be admitted into the Union as a state.