There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Administration Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to permanently appropriate funding for the administrative expenses of the Social Security Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/27/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/28/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/28/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/28/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/03/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/03/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/03/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/03/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/03/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/10/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/26/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/06/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/27/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/27/2018 Referred to
House Budget06/27/2018 Referred to
House Rules06/27/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/27/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.