There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to establish measures to combat invasive lionfish, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/20/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1089, Part I.
06/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
12/20/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1089, Part I.
09/26/2018Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/26/2018Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
08/02/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/10/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 09/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/27/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations08/02/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/27/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
12/20/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1089
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans07/10/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6255.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6255. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2018)

This bill adds various lionfish species to the list of injurious wildlife prohibited from being imported into the United States or transported between states.