There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PreCheck is PreCheck Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

PreCheck is PreCheck Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

PreCheck is PreCheck Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that only travelers who are members of a trusted traveler program use Transportation Security Administration security screening lanes designated for trusted travelers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7807-7809)
09/04/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-912.
06/28/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/05/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/04/2018-7:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/04/2018-7:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7807-7809)
09/04/2018-7:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6265.
09/04/2018-7:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7807-7809)
09/04/2018-7:08pmHouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/04/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 708.
09/04/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-912.
07/24/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseSubcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security Discharged.
07/16/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/28/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
06/28/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/28/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/28/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/28/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
09/04/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-912
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security07/16/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/05/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6265.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6265. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2018)

PreCheck is PreCheck Act of 2018

This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to ensure that only travelers who are members of a trusted traveler program are permitted to use TSA PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints.

Any traveler under the age of 12 or over the age of 75 who is not a member of a trusted traveler program shall be permitted to utilize PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints when traveling on the same reservation as a member of a trusted traveler program.

The TSA shall implement a risk modified screening protocol for lanes other than designated TSA PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints to further segment passengers based on risk. Only low-risk passengers shall be eligible to undergo risk modified screening at TSA checkpoints.

The Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security must assess whether there has been a systematic pattern of violations of the use of TSA PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints during the previous calendar year.

The TSA shall complete the implementation of a long-term strategy to increase enrollment in the TSA PreCheck Program and expand the total population of members of trusted traveler programs.