Text: H.R.6274 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2018)


115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6274


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend certain tax credits related to electric cars, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

June 28, 2018

Mr. Welch (for himself, Mr. Huffman, and Ms. Rosen) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend certain tax credits related to electric cars, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Electric Credit Access Ready at Sale Act of 2018” or the “Electric CARS Act of 2018”.

SEC. 2. Extension and modification of new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicles credit.

(a) Extension.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 30D(e) of such Code is amended to read as follows:

“(e) Termination.—This section shall not apply to any new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicle placed in service after December 31, 2028.”.

(2) 2- AND 3-WHEELED PLUG-IN ELECTRIC VEHICLES.—Section 30D(g)(3)(E) is amended by striking “or” at the end of clause (i), by redesignating clause (ii) as clause (iii), and by inserting after clause (i) the following new clause:

“(ii) after December 31, 2017, and before January 1, 2029, or”.

(b) Credit may be assigned to financing entity.—Section 30D(f) of such Code is amended by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(8) CREDIT MAY BE ASSIGNED TO FINANCING ENTITY.—

“(A) IN GENERAL.—The credit which would (but for this paragraph) be allowed with respect to a vehicle under subsection (a) for any taxable year to any person (hereafter in this paragraph referred to as the ‘initial taxpayer’)—

“(i) if assigned by the initial taxpayer to the person who financed the purchase (or a lease of at least 2 years) of such vehicle by the initial taxpayer, may be taken into account by such person, and

“(ii) shall not be taken into account by the initial taxpayer.

Any person to whom such credit is assigned under clause (i) shall be treated for purposes of this title as the taxpayer that placed such vehicle in service.

“(B) DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENT.—Subparagraph (A) shall not apply with respect to any vehicle unless the person to whom the credit is assigned clearly discloses in writing to the initial taxpayer the amount of the credit allowable under subsection (a) with respect to such vehicle (determined without regard to subsection (c)).”.

(c) Effective dates.—

(1) The amendments made by subsection (a) shall apply to vehicles acquired after December 31, 2017.

(2) The amendment made by subsection (b) shall apply to vehicles acquired more than 60 days after the date of the enactment of this Act.

SEC. 3. Extension of the alternative fuel vehicle refueling property credit.

(a) In general.—Section 30C(g) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “2017” and inserting “2028”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by this section shall apply to property placed in service after December 31, 2017.

SEC. 4. Extension of the alternative motor vehicle credit.

(a) In general.—Section 30B(k) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “2017” in paragraph (1) and inserting “2028”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by this section shall apply to property placed in service after December 31, 2017.