There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Increasing Access to Lower Premium Plans and Expanding Health Savings Accounts Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Increasing Access to Lower Premium Plans Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 and the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to modify the definition of qualified health plan for purposes of the health insurance premium tax credit and to allow individuals purchasing health insurance in the individual market to purchase a lower premium copper plan.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 242 - 176 (Roll no. 376).(text: CR H7658-7659)
07/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-849, Part I.
07/06/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
07/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/25/2018-6:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2018-6:15pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 242 - 176 (Roll no. 376). (text: CR H7658-7659)
07/25/2018-6:08pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 229 (Roll no. 375).
07/25/2018-5:42pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
07/25/2018-5:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Frankel (FL) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment stating no amendment made by this Act shall take effect until the annual reports of the Board of the Trustees of the Federal Hospital Insurance Trust Fund established under section 1817 of the Social Security Act and the Federal Supplementary Medical Insurance Trust Fund indicate the reduction of solvency of such trust funds by reason of Public Law 115-97 have been reversed.
07/25/2018-5:38pmHouseMs. Frankel (FL) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Ways and Means.
07/25/2018-5:37pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/25/2018-4:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6311.
07/25/2018-4:38pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 184 and H.R. 6311. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 184 and H.R. 6311 both under closed rules. The rule provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure.
07/25/2018-4:38pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1011. (consideration: CR H7658-7667)
07/24/2018-2:37pmHouseRule H. Res. 1011 passed House.
07/23/2018-7:12pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1011 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 184 and H.R. 6311. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 184 and H.R. 6311 both under closed rules. The rule provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure.
07/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-849, Part I.
07/11/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16.
07/11/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/06/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/06/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/06/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/06/2018 Referred to
07/11/2018 Markup by
07/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-849

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6311. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/06/2018)

This bill modifies the requirements for the premium assistance tax credit and allows all individuals to purchase catastrophic health plans in the individual market.

(Under current law, the premium assistance tax credit is provided to eligible individuals and families to subsidize the purchase of health insurance plans on an exchange established under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.) The bill modifies the credit to:

  • make the credit available for catastrophic qualified health plans and plans that are not offered through an exchange, but otherwise meet the requirements for qualified health plans;
  • prohibit advance payments of the credit from being made for a health plan that is not enrolled in through an exchange; and
  • prohibit the credit from being used for health plans that cover abortions (other than abortions necessary to save the life of the mother or abortions with respect to a pregnancy that is the result of an act of rape or incest).

The bill also modifies the requirements for minimum essential health benefits to allow all individuals purchasing health insurance in the individual market to purchase a lower premium catastrophic plan. (The plans are currently limited to individuals who are under 30 or qualify for a hardship or affordability exemption.)