There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Advocacy Improvements Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Business Advocacy Improvements Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Advocacy Improvements Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify the primary functions and duties of the Office of Advocacy of the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8804)
09/12/2018Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-938.
07/06/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
09/25/2018-5:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-5:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8804)
09/25/2018-5:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6316.
09/25/2018-5:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8804-8805)
09/25/2018-5:08pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/12/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 729.
09/12/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-938.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported.
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/06/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
07/06/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/06/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business07/06/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
09/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-938
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship09/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6316.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6316. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/06/2018)

Small Business Advocacy Improvements Act of 2019

This bill expands the primary functions and additional duties of the Office of Advocacy of the Small Business Administration to include: (1) examining the role of small businesses in the international economy, and (2) representing the views and interests of small businesses before foreign governments and international entities to contribute to regulatory and trade initiatives that may affect small businesses.