There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Small Business Runway Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Runway Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Business Runway Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Runway Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Small Business Runway Extension Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to modify the method for prescribing size standards for business concerns.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2018Became Public Law No: 115-324. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2018Signed by President.
12/11/2018Presented to President.
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/06/2018Senate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7333)
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8805)
09/12/2018Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-939.
07/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/17/2018Became Public Law No: 115-324. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2018Signed by President.
12/11/2018HousePresented to President.
12/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/06/2018SenateSenate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7333)
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
09/25/2018-5:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-5:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8805)
09/25/2018-5:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6330.
09/25/2018-5:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8805-8806)
09/25/2018-5:16pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/12/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 730.
09/12/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-939.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
07/11/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
07/11/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business07/11/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
09/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-939
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship09/26/2018 Referred to
12/06/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6330. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-324 (12/17/2018)

Small Business Runway Extension Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Act to revise certain requirements for prescribing size standards for small businesses. Such standards shall be calculated using average annual gross receipts of such businesses from at least the previous five (currently, three) years.