There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

7(a) Real Estate Appraisal Harmonization Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

7(a) Real Estate Appraisal Harmonization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

7(a) Real Estate Appraisal Harmonization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

7(a) Real Estate Appraisal Harmonization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

7(a) Real Estate Appraisal Harmonization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To adjust the real estate appraisal thresholds under the 7(a) program to bring them into line with the thresholds used by the Federal banking regulators, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-370.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/19/2018Senate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: S7896-7897)
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8803-8804)
09/12/2018Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-940.
07/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-370.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/19/2018SenateSenate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: S7896-7897)
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
09/25/2018-5:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-5:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8803-8804)
09/25/2018-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6347.
09/25/2018-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8803-8804)
09/25/2018-5:00pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/12/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 731.
09/12/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-940.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported.
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/12/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
07/12/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 07/12/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business07/12/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
09/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-940
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship09/26/2018 Referred to
12/19/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6347. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-370 (12/21/2018)

7(a) Real Estate Appraisal Harmonization Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Act to revise the loan amount above which a real estate appraisal is required for a commercial real property securing a small business loan. Specifically, the bill ties the amount to the federal banking regulator appraisal threshold. (Currently, an appraisal is required for a loan of more than $250,000.)