There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Expanding Contracting Opportunities for Small Businesses Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Expanding Contracting Opportunities for Small Businesses Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Expanding Contracting Opportunities for Small Businesses Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to eliminate the inclusion of option years in the award price for sole source contracts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 5 (Roll no. 401).(text: CR H8810-8811)
09/12/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-943.
07/13/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
09/25/2018-7:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-7:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 5 (Roll no. 401). (text: CR H8810-8811)
09/25/2018-7:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8821)
09/25/2018-5:52pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Chabot objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
09/25/2018-5:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6369.
09/25/2018-5:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8810-8812)
09/25/2018-5:45pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/12/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 734.
09/12/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-943.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/13/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
07/13/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 07/13/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 07/17/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business07/13/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
09/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-943
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship09/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6369.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.