There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FIT Act
Fitness Information Transparency Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

FIT Act
Fitness Information Transparency Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Department of Homeland Security to streamline Federal contractor fitness determinations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/04/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-913.
07/13/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
09/05/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/04/2018-5:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/04/2018-5:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7799-7800)
09/04/2018-5:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6374.
09/04/2018-5:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7799-7801)
09/04/2018-5:47pmHouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/04/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 709.
09/04/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-913.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/17/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/13/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
07/13/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/13/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security07/13/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
09/04/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-913
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency07/17/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/05/2018 Referred to

As of 12/12/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6374 - Fitness Information Transparency Act of 2018.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.