There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To reauthorize certain programs under the Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness Reauthorization Act.

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize certain programs under the Public Health Service Act and the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to public health security and all-hazards preparedness and response, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8759-8775)
07/16/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/25/2018-3:28pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-3:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-3:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8759-8775)
09/25/2018-3:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6378.
09/25/2018-3:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8759-8789)
09/25/2018-3:04pmHouseMrs. Brooks (IN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/17/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/16/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/16/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/16/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/16/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
House Judiciary07/16/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/16/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/16/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security07/16/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications07/17/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/2018)

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2018

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to establish several programs and entities relating to public health emergency preparedness and response, including:

  • an interagency advisory panel on health security,
  • a dedicated unit within the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to address the needs of children during public health emergencies,
  • a grant program to support the provision of services by military trauma teams at high-acuity trauma centers, and
  • programs to address pandemic influenza and emerging infectious diseases.

The bill also reauthorizes for FY2019-FY2023 and revises several other programs and entities relating to public health emergencies, including the National Disaster Medical System, the Volunteer Medical Reserve Corps, and the Biomedical Advanced Research and Development Authority.

The bill also expands the responsibilities of the Assistant Secretary for Preparedness and Response (ASPR) and the scope of the National Health Security Strategy.

ASPR must also develop a strategy to reunify children and parents who were separated at the U.S.-Mexico border under a specified immigration enforcement policy (i.e., the "zero-tolerance" policy) and submit weekly reports on the status and welfare of children awaiting reunification.