There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 24930 Washington Avenue in Murrieta, California, as the "Riverside County Iraq and Afghanistan Veterans Memorial Post Office".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/24/2017Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/24/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/01/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/01/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/27/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/27/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/27/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/27/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/17/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/17/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/13/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/15/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/27/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/27/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/03/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/03/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/04/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/04/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/10/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/10/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/10/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/10/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/10/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/12/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 10/12/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 10/12/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform01/24/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.638.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.638. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 24930 Washington Avenue in Murrieta, California, as the "Riverside County Iraq and Afghanistan Veterans Memorial Post Office."