There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 23, United States Code, to extend the deadline for promulgation of regulations under the tribal transportation self-governance program.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
08/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-235. (TXT | PDF)
08/14/2018Signed by President.
08/03/2018Presented to President.
08/01/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5560)
07/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7639)
07/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-235. (TXT | PDF)
08/14/2018Signed by President.
08/03/2018HousePresented to President.
08/02/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5560)
07/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/25/2018-2:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2018-2:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7639)
07/25/2018-2:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6414.
07/25/2018-2:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7639-7640)
07/25/2018-2:27pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/19/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
07/18/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/18/2018 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit07/19/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6414.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6414. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-235 (08/14/2018)

This bill extends: (1) from 21 to 42 months after the enactment of the Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act or the FAST Act (i.e., December 4, 2015), the authority to publish proposed regulations in the Federal Register to carry out the tribal transportation self-governance program; and (2) from 30 to 48 months after such date, the authority to promulgate regulations for such program.