There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

AG and Legal Workforce Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • AG Act
  • Agricultural Guestworker Act
  • Legal Workforce Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To create a nonimmigrant H-2C work visa program for agricultural workers, to make mandatory and permanent requirements relating to use of an electronic employment eligibility verification system, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/18/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (112)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 07/18/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 07/18/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/19/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2018
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 07/19/2018
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/19/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/19/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/23/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 07/23/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/23/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/23/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/23/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/23/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/23/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/23/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/23/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/23/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/23/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/24/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 07/24/2018
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/24/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/24/2018
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 07/25/2018
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 07/25/2018
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/25/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/26/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/26/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 07/26/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 08/03/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 08/03/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 08/03/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 08/03/2018
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 08/07/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/14/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 08/14/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 08/17/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 08/24/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/24/2018
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 08/24/2018
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 08/24/2018
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 08/24/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/24/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 08/31/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 08/31/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/04/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/04/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/04/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/04/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/04/2018
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/04/2018
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/04/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/06/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 09/06/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/06/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/06/2018
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 09/06/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 09/07/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/07/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/12/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/12/2018
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/13/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/27/2018
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 10/02/2018
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2018 09/06/2018 H7887
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 08/17/2018 09/12/2018 H8159

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/18/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security09/19/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce07/18/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/18/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/18/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6417. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2018)

AG and Legal Workforce Act

This bill establishes a new H-2C nonimmigrant visa for aliens coming temporarily to the United States to perform agricultural labor or services. In addition, the bill (1) directs the Department of Homeland Security to create an electronic employment-eligibility confirmation system modeled after the E-Verify system, and (2) mandates the use of such a system by employers.