There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Secure America from Russian Interference Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • CPR for Russian Civil Society Act
  • Countering Foreign Propaganda Act of 2018
  • Honest Ads Act
  • Punishing Continued Occupation of Ukraine Act
  • SECURE Our Democracy Act
  • Safeguard our Elections and Combat Unlawful Interference in Our Democracy Act
  • Stand with UK against Russia Violations Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To combat subversive activities of the Russian Federation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/19/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), the Judiciary, Armed Services, House Administration, Energy and Commerce, Appropriations, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 07/19/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/23/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/23/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 07/23/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 07/23/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/23/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/26/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/26/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/26/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/26/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/26/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/26/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 08/03/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/06/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/12/2018

Committees (9)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/19/2018 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)07/19/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary07/19/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services07/19/2018 Referred to
House Administration07/19/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/19/2018 Referred to
House Appropriations07/19/2018 Referred to
House Financial Services07/19/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform07/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (66)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.