There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security an Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/28/2018Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-908.
07/19/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/05/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/04/2018-7:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/04/2018-7:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7810)
09/04/2018-7:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6438.
09/04/2018-7:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7810-7811)
09/04/2018-7:26pmHouseMr. Perry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/28/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 704.
08/28/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-908.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/19/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
07/19/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/19/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security07/19/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
08/28/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-908
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/05/2018 Referred to

As of 11/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.6438 - DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.6438. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/04/2018)

DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to designate a DHS official as the Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems (UAS) Coordinator to coordinate with relevant DHS offices and components on the development of policies and plans to counter threats associated with UAS, including:

  • countering UAS that may be used in a terrorist attack;
  • promoting research and development of counter UAS technologies;
  • ensuring the dissemination of information and guidance related to countering such threats; and
  • serving as the DHS point of contact for federal, state, local, and tribal law enforcement entities and the private sector regarding DHS activities to counter UAS.

The coordinator shall: (1) ensure that activities for identifying, assessing, or defeating a UAS are carried out in accordance with applicable federal laws; and (2) serve as the principal DHS official for disseminating information regarding counter-UAS technology to the private sector.