There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program Authorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security the Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-419.
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 272 - 119 (Roll no. 381).(text: CR H7786-7787)
08/28/2018Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-909.
07/19/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/05/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 724.
12/05/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-419.
09/26/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
09/05/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/04/2018-7:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/04/2018-7:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 272 - 119 (Roll no. 381). (text: CR H7786-7787)
09/04/2018-6:55pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR S7806)
09/04/2018-4:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/04/2018-4:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6439.
09/04/2018-4:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7786-7789)
09/04/2018-4:33pmHouseMr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/28/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 705.
08/28/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-909.
07/24/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/24/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/19/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
07/19/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security07/19/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
08/28/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-909
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/05/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
12/05/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-419

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.6439. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/04/2018)

Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program Authorization Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide statutory authority for the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program (BITMAP). That program was established to address and reduce national security, border security, and terrorist threats before such threats reach the international border of the United States.

In carrying out BITMAP operations, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement must: (1) coordinate foreign and U.S. officials to facilitate the sharing of biometric and biographic information of foreign nationals to identify and screen such nationals for terrorism and threats to national or border security; (2) provide capabilities, including training and equipment, to collect and compare biometric and biographic identification data of foreign nationals to protect against national security, border security, or terrorist threats and illegal entries; and (3) ensure that such data are incorporated into appropriate government databases.

Before carrying out BITMAP operations in a foreign country, DHS must enter into an agreement with the government of such country that outlines such operations and must provide the congressional homeland security committees with a copy of the agreement.