There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to amend the Definite Plan Report for the Seedskadee Project to enable the use of the active capacity of the Fontenelle Reservoir.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/25/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-235.
03/15/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 160).(text: CR H2064)
01/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
04/25/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 390.
04/25/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-235.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/08/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/15/2017-7:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/15/2017-7:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 160). (text: CR H2064)
03/15/2017-6:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2067-2068)
03/15/2017-4:56pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/15/2017-4:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 648.
03/15/2017-4:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2064-2065)
03/15/2017-4:50pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/24/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/24/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/24/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans02/10/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/21/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-235

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.648. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (04/25/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior, in cooperation with the state of Wyoming, to amend the Definite Plan Report for the Seedskadee Project (authorized under the Colorado River Storage Project Act) to provide for the study, design, planning, and construction activities that will enable the use of all active storage capacity of Fontenelle Dam and Reservoir, including the placement of sufficient riprap on the upstream face of the dam to allow such storage capacity to be used for authorized project purposes.

Interior may enter into: (1) any contract, grant, cooperative agreement, or other agreement that is necessary to carry out this bill; and (2) contracts with Wyoming for division of any additional active capacity made available under this bill.

Interior must enter into a cooperative agreement with Wyoming for planning, design, related preconstruction activities, and construction of any modification of the Fontenelle Dam, which shall specify the responsibilities of Interior and Wyoming regarding: (1) completing the planning and final design of the modification of the dam, (2) any environmental and cultural resource compliance activities required for the modification of the dam, and (3) the construction of the modification of the dam.