There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Negotiation and Competitive Licensing Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to negotiate prices of prescription drugs furnished under part D of the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/25/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
08/03/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/27/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/25/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/25/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/25/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/25/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 07/25/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/25/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/25/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/25/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 07/25/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/26/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/26/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/27/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/03/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/07/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/10/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/12/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/12/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/26/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/27/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/28/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/28/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/28/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/02/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/02/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/05/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 12/19/2018
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-15] 12/19/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/20/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/20/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/25/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/27/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/25/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health08/03/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6505.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6505. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/25/2018)

Medicare Negotiation and Competitive Licensing Act of 2018

This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to negotiate with pharmaceutical companies regarding prices for drugs covered under the Medicare prescription drug benefit. (Current law prohibits the CMS from doing so.)

The CMS must take certain factors into account during negotiations, including the clinical- and cost-effectiveness of the drug, the financial burden on patients, and unmet patient needs. If the CMS is unable to negotiate the price of a drug, such drug is subject to competitive licensing in order to further its sale under Medicare, notwithstanding existing government-granted exclusivities.

Additionally, for one year after a drug is provided under a competitive license, such drug is also subject to specified price limitations; if the drug is not offered at such prices, the drug is subject to additional licensing that furthers its sale under any federal program (e.g., Medicaid).