There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Aim Higher Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend and strengthen the Higher Education Act of 1965 so that every student has a path to a quality, debt-free degree or credential that leads to a rewarding career.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/26/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/27/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 07/27/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/27/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/27/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/27/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/27/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/27/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/27/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/27/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/27/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/27/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/27/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/27/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/27/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/27/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/27/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/27/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/27/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 07/27/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 07/27/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/27/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/27/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/27/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/27/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/27/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/27/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2018
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/27/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/21/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 08/21/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 08/21/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/21/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/21/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 08/21/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/21/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 08/21/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/05/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/05/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/05/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/12/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/12/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/25/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/26/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/26/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/26/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/26/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 11/06/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/06/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/06/2018
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/06/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/14/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/14/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 11/20/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/27/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/29/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/29/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 11/29/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 11/29/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/10/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/11/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/19/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/19/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/26/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.