There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Northern Mariana Islands Workforce Stabilization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 6 of the Joint Resolution entitled "A Joint Resolution to approve the Covenant To Establish a Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands in Political Union with the United States of America, and for other purposes".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
10/01/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/13/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2018Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2018Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/27/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/27/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/27/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/31/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/31/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/14/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/14/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/14/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/14/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 08/21/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 08/21/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/21/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 09/04/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/05/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/07/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/10/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/13/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/12/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/12/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/26/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs08/13/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary07/26/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security10/01/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6578.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6578. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

Northern Mariana Islands Workforce Stabilization Act

This bill establishes a process under which certain long-term residents of the Northern Mariana Islands who are workers or investors with specified temporary visas may obtain lawful permanent resident status.