There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

REUNITE Act
Reunite Every Unaccompanied Newborn Infant, Toddler and other children Expeditiously Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reunite families separated at or near ports of entry, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/01/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/26/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/31/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/31/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/31/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 08/03/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/28/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/26/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security10/01/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6594. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

Reunite Every Unaccompanied Newborn Infant, Toddler and other children Expeditiously Act or the REUNITE Act

This bill directs the Departments of Homeland Security (DHS) and Health and Human Services (HHS), after consultation with humanitarian organizations, child welfare agencies, and states bordering Mexico, to promulgate and publish a rule describing efforts that DHS and HHS will undertake to aid apprehended parents or legal guardians in locating and reuniting with any children (under age 18 with no permanent immigration status) separated from them at or near the port of entry, or within 100 miles of the border. DHS, HHS, and the Department of Justice (DOJ) must provide apprehended parents or legal guardians separated from their children with written notice, in a language understandable to them, of any rules or guidance that may assist them in locating and reuniting with their children.

The bill permits DHS and HHS to use DNA testing to determine family relationships subject to certain requirements, after using other commonly-used techniques for determining such relationships.

DHS must establish secure alternative programs that incorporate case management services in each DHS field office to ensure appearances by alien parents and children at immigration proceedings and public safety and to provide for community-based alternatives to detention.

DHS, DOJ, and HHS shall establish an interagency Office for Locating and Reuniting Children with Parents for facilitating the reunification of children and apprehended parents or legal guardians after entering the United States.

The bill requires DOJ to appoint counsel, free of charge, for children and vulnerable aliens (e.g., persons with disabilities and victims of abuse, torture, or violence) in immigration proceedings.

The bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act (INA) to limit bonds for detained aliens to $1,500, except for aliens who have committed an aggravated felony (as defined by the INA).