There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the application of temporary limited appointment regulations to the National Park Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8859)
09/25/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-967.
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/12/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/25/2018-9:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-9:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8859)
09/25/2018-9:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6599.
09/25/2018-9:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8859-8860)
09/25/2018-9:10pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 755.
09/25/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-967.
09/05/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/05/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 07/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/26/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-967
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/26/2018 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks12/12/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.6599.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6599. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

This bill modifies the application of specified geographic requirements with respect to seasonal employees of the National Park Service.