There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the New Jersey Coastal Heritage Trail Route, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/10/2019Became Public Law No: 115-431. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S8025)
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 382 - 9 (Roll no. 473).
12/03/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1061.
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/10/2019Became Public Law No: 115-431. (TXT | PDF)
01/10/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8025)
12/21/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/20/2018-8:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-8:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 382 - 9 (Roll no. 473).
12/20/2018-7:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10500)
12/19/2018-4:56pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McClintock objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/19/2018-4:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6602.
12/19/2018-4:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10302-10303; text: CR H10302)
12/19/2018-4:48pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/03/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 827.
12/03/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1061.
11/15/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/15/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/15/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
08/16/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/26/2018 Referred to
11/15/2018 Markup by
12/03/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1061
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/16/2018 Referred to
11/15/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6602. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-431 (01/10/2019)

This bill reauthorizes the New Jersey Coastal Heritage Trail Route through FY2025.