There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Traumatic Brain Injury Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Traumatic Brain Injury Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Traumatic Brain Injury Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Traumatic Brain Injury Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Traumatic Brain Injury program.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-377. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 352 - 6 (Roll No. 437).(text: CR H10280-10281)
12/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10057)
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-377. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/19/2018-7:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2018-7:06pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 352 - 6 (Roll No. 437). (text: CR H10280-10281)
12/19/2018-3:30pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/19/2018-3:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 6615.
12/19/2018-3:20pmHouseMr. Walden moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10280-10282, H10314)
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4155 Amendment SA 4155 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4155 Amendment SA 4155 proposed by Senator Grassley for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S7745-7746; text: CR S7745-7746) In the nature of a substitute.
12/18/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7745-7746)
12/12/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 730.
12/11/2018-2:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-2:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10057)
12/11/2018-1:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6615.
12/11/2018-1:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10057-10058)
12/11/2018-1:49pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce07/26/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/27/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6615. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-377 (12/21/2018)

Traumatic Brain Injury Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize for FY2020-FY2024 several programs relating to traumatic brain injuries, including the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) grant program for state surveillance systems that monitor traumatic brain injuries.

The bill authorizes the CDC to collect and analyze data regarding the national prevalence and incidence of concussions. Additionally, the bill repeals outdated provisions regarding a CDC traumatic brain injury study.