There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

JOLT Act of 2018
Jobs Originated through Launching Travel Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to stimulate international tourism to the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/01/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/20/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/26/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/26/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security10/01/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6618.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6618. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

Jobs Originated through Launching Travel Act of 2018 or the JOLT Act of 2018

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to grant a visitor visa for up to a 240 days to a citizen of Canada who is at least 50 years of age, maintains a residence in Canada, owns a residence or has signed a rental agreement in the United States, is not otherwise inadmissible, will not engage in employment in the United States, and will not seek any form of public assistance or benefits.

The bill revises the visa waiver program and renames it as the security travel partnership program. DHS may designate any country as a program country if its meets specified requirements.

The Department of State must (1) require diplomatic and consular missions to conduct nonimmigrant visa application interviews expeditiously and set a goal of interviewing visa applicants, worldwide, within 15 days of application receipt; (2) develop and conduct a pilot program for processing visas using secure remote videoconferencing technology for conducting visa interviews; and (3) seek to coordinate enrollment and interview processes for individuals eligible for both a U.S. visa and enrollment in the Global Entry program operated by U.S. Customs and Border Protection.