There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Critical Infrastructure Against Drones and Emerging Threats Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Critical Infrastructure Against Drones and Emerging Threats Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Department of Homeland Security to prepare a threat assessment relating to unmanned aircraft systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8750)
09/25/2018Committee on Transportation discharged.
09/25/2018Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-960, Part I.
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/25/2018-2:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-2:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8750)
09/25/2018-2:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6620.
09/25/2018-2:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8750-8752)
09/25/2018-2:33pmHouseMr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 748.
09/25/2018HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
09/25/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-960, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/13/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/13/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/13/2018HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/13/2018HouseSubcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/20/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/20/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/20/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/20/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/27/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/26/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/26/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 07/26/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security07/26/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-960
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence08/20/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Discharged from
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency08/20/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/26/2018 Referred to
09/25/2018 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation07/27/2018 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6620.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6620. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

Protecting Critical Infrastructure Against Drones and Emerging Threats Act

This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security to:

  • request additional information from other agencies of the federal government, state and local government agencies, and the private sector relating to threats of unmanned aircraft systems (drones) and other emerging threats associated with such new technologies;
  • develop and disseminate a security threat assessment regarding drones and other emerging threats associated with such new technologies; and
  • establish and utilize a secure communications and information technology infrastructure, including data-mining and other advanced analytical tools.