There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the Federal building located at 2110 First Street in Fort Myers, Florida, as the "George W. Whitehurst Federal Building and United States Courthouse".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building located at 2110 First Street in Fort Myers, Florida, as the "George W. Whitehurst Federal Building".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9656)
11/13/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1021.
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/28/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
11/27/2018-7:36pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-7:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-7:36pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9656)
11/27/2018-7:36pmHouseH.Amdt.981 On agreeing to the Mast amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-7:36pmHouseH.Amdt.981 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Mast. (consideration: CR H9656; text: CR H9656)
11/27/2018-7:35pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9656)
11/27/2018-7:35pmHouseMr. Mast asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/13/2018HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 190.
11/13/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1021.
09/27/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/27/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/27/2018HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
07/27/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
07/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation07/26/2018 Referred to
09/27/2018 Markup by
11/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1021
House Transportation Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management07/27/2018 Referred to
09/27/2018 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works11/28/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6622.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6622. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

This bill designates the federal building at 2110 First Street in Fort Myers, Florida, as the "George W. Whitehurst Federal Building."