There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To extend certain authorities relating to United States efforts to combat HIV/AIDS, tuberculosis, and malaria globally, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To extend certain authorities relating to United Sates efforts to combat HIV/AIDS, tuberculosis, and malaria globally, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-305. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/30/2018Presented to President.
11/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7193-7194)
11/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H 9488)
11/09/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1014.
08/03/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-305. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/30/2018HousePresented to President.
11/29/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7193-7194)
11/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/13/2018-5:22pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2018-5:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2018-5:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H 9488)
11/13/2018-4:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6651.
11/13/2018-4:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9488-9491)
11/13/2018-4:54pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/09/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 793.
11/09/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1014.
09/27/2018HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
08/03/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
08/03/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs08/03/2018 Referred to
09/27/2018 Markup by
11/09/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1014

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6651. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-305 (12/11/2018)

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018

This bill amends the United States Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria Act of 2003 to extend certain provisions related to the U.S. President's Emergency Plan for AIDS Relief (PEPFAR), a government initiative addressing the global HIV/AIDS epidemic. Specifically, the bill extends through FY2023 provisions that:

  • require the Inspectors General of the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for Global Media, jointly with the Department of Health and Human Services and the U.S. Agency for International Development, to coordinate and conduct oversight of PEPFAR programs,
  • limit U.S. contributions to the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria to 33% of funds contributed from all sources,
  • require that certain fund contributions be withheld under specified circumstances, such as if funds were previously used to assist a country that has repeatedly supported acts of international terrorism, and
  • require that more than half of the PEPFAR budget be allocated for specified HIV/AIDS treatment and care.

The bill also extends through FY2024 annual reporting requirements relating to HIV/AIDS treatment providers and costs.