There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain facilities, easements, and rights-of-way to the Kennewick Irrigation District, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 359 - 1 (Roll no. 443).(text: CR H10305-10306)
12/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1082.
08/03/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/20/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/19/2018-7:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2018-7:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 359 - 1 (Roll no. 443). (text: CR H10305-10306)
12/19/2018-7:39pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10318-10319)
12/19/2018-5:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McClintock objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/19/2018-5:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6652.
12/19/2018-5:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10305-10306)
12/19/2018-5:12pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/19/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 841.
12/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1082.
11/15/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/15/2018HouseSubcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
09/05/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
08/29/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/03/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
08/03/2018HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1123)
08/03/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources08/03/2018 Referred to
11/15/2018 Markup by
12/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1082
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans08/29/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Hearings by
11/15/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6652.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6652. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/03/2018)

This bill directs the Bureau of Reclamation to enter into an agreement with the Kennewick Irrigation District, located in Benton County, Washington, to convey to the district the canals, laterals, and appurtenant works and lands that begin at the district's head gate and extend approximately 40 miles east to the Columbia River.