There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Offshore Wind for Territories Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Offshore Wind for Territories Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Offshore Wind for Territories Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to apply to territories of the United States, to establish offshore wind lease sale requirements, to provide dedicated funding for coral reef conservation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9778-9779)
11/16/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1029.
08/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/11/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/10/2018-4:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2018-4:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9778-9779)
12/10/2018-4:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6665.
12/10/2018-4:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9778-9781)
12/10/2018-3:59pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/16/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 803.
11/16/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1029.
09/05/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/05/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/10/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
08/10/2018HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1137)
08/10/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources08/10/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Markup by
11/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1029

No related bill information was received for H.R.6665.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6665. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/10/2018)

Offshore Wind for Territories Act

This bill amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to authorize offshore wind development in the U.S. Exclusive Economic Zone adjacent to U.S. territories.

The bill also establishes the Coral Reef Conservation Fund for the Department of Commerce to carry out the Coral Reef Conservation Act of 2000, including to preserve, sustain, and restore the condition of coral reef ecosystems.