There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to grant to States and local governments easements and rights-of-way over Federal land within Gateway National Recreation Area for construction, operation, and maintenance of projects for control and prevention of flooding and shoreline erosion.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/14/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 11/13/2018 H9487)
10/23/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-995.
08/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/15/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/14/2018-5:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2018-5:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 11/13/2018 H9487)
11/14/2018-5:09pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9522)
11/13/2018-4:53pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Gosar objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
11/13/2018-4:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6666.
11/13/2018-4:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9487-9488)
11/13/2018-4:48pmHouseMr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/23/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 777.
10/23/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-995.
09/26/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/26/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
08/17/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/10/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
08/10/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources08/10/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
10/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-995
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/17/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6666.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6666. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/10/2018)

This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to grant to any state or local government an easement or right-of-way over federal lands within Gateway National Recreation Area in the states of New York and New Jersey to construct, operate, or maintain projects for the control and prevention of flooding and shoreline erosion.