There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protection and Transparency for Adjacent Landowners Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protection and Transparency for Adjacent Landowners Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to improve the transparency and oversight of land conveyances involving disposal or acquisition of National Forest System lands or Bureau of Land Management public lands, to provide protections and certainty for private landowners related to resurveying such public lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/03/2018Committee on Agriculture discharged.
12/03/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1060, Part I.
08/28/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
12/03/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 826.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2018Committee on Agriculture discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1060, Part I.
09/26/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/26/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/26/2018Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
09/20/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
09/06/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
08/30/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/28/2018Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/28/2018Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/28/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources08/28/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
12/03/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1060
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/30/2018 Referred to
09/06/2018 Hearings by
09/26/2018 Discharged from
House Agriculture08/28/2018 Referred to
12/03/2018 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry09/20/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6682. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/28/2018)

Protection and Transparency for Adjacent Landowners Act

This bill amends the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to instruct the Department of the Interior or the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to provide advance written notification to each owner of land that is adjacent to a parcel to be acquired to become public lands or National Forest System (NFS) lands.

Interior or USDA must provide advance written notification to each owner of land that is adjacent to a parcel of public lands or NFS lands to be conveyed by sale, exchange, or other disposal method.

The Bureau of Land Management, before commencing a resurvey of federal land under its administrative jurisdiction, must notify all property owners who have land abutting or adjacent to the land being resurveyed.