There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to manage the Point Reyes National Seashore in the State of California consistently with Congress' long-standing intent to continue to authorize working dairies and ranches on agricultural property as part of the seashore's unique historic, cultural, scenic and natural values, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to manage the Point Reyes National Seashore in the State of California consistent with Congress' longstanding intent to maintain working dairies and ranches on agricultural property as part of the seashore's unique historic, cultural, scenic and natural values, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8857)
09/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-968.
08/28/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/12/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/25/2018-9:07pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-9:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-9:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8857)
09/25/2018-8:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6687.
09/25/2018-8:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8856-8858)
09/25/2018-8:56pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 756.
09/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-968.
09/05/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/05/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/28/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
08/28/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 08/28/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources08/28/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-968
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/26/2018 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks12/12/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.6687.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6687. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/28/2018)

This bill requires the Department of the Interior to manage certain agricultural property in California consistent with Congress's intent to maintain working dairies and ranches on the property as part of the unique historic, cultural, scenic, and natural values of the Point Reyes National Seashore. Interior must manage tule elk present on the property as directed by the bill.